RI S2307 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require insurers to send insureds a notice captioned "Insurance Coverage Reduction Notice" itemizing and describing any coverage elimination, reduction, diminution or increased deductible not at the request of the insureds.
Title
Casualty Insurance Generally
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |