RI S2298 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Grant cities and towns the right to tax or enter into a stabilization agreement with a for-profit hospital facility that had not been converted from a nonprofit hospital facility.
Title
State Aid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/30/2014) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2014) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2014) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |