RI S2297 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the minimum penalty for first degree sexual assault from ten (10) to twenty (20) years. The act would also create a category of cases wherein the first ten (10) years of any sentence be ineligible for the benefits of deferment or suspension.
Title
Sexual Assault
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/27/2018) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2297.pdf |