RI S2291 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- THE NATHAN BRUNO AND JASON FLATT ACT - Provides that in the event of the death of an educator or a student, a local educational agency be given up to five (5) days after the death to implement a flexible school schedule for teachers and students.
Title
Provides that in the event of the death of an educator or a student, a local educational agency be given up to five (5) days after the death to implement a flexible school schedule for teachers and students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2291.pdf |