RI S2280 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit municipal building officials from assessing a fee for the first reinspection of work which has failed the initial inspection
Title
State Building Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-08-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2014) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2014) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |