RI S2270 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Motion Picture Production Tax Credits (would Allow Lower Budget Motion Picture Productions To Qualify For Rhode Island Tax Credits.)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Motion Picture Production Tax Credits (would Allow Lower Budget Motion Picture Productions To Qualify For Rhode Island Tax Credits.)
Sponsors
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Committee heard and continued | |
2012-04-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2012) | |
2012-04-06 | Meeting postponed (04/12/2012) | |
2012-04-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2012-04-04 | Meeting postponed (04/05/2012) | |
2012-03-23 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2270.pdf |