RI S2264 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits that education on consent and sexual activity be increased in secondary schools as part of a family life course.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2018) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |