RI S2258 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminates the requirement that a service person serving in conflicts or undeclared wars receive a campaign ribbon or expeditionary medal in order to receive a property tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' Exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-22HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-21HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2018)
2018-04-26HouseReferred to House Veterans Affairs
2018-04-25SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/25/2018)
2018-04-11SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for consideration (04/11/2018)
2018-03-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback