RI S2247 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline (would Add A Definition For Medical Records To The Current Statute.)
Title
An Act Relating To The Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline (would Add A Definition For Medical Records To The Current Statute.)
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] |
Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-16 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-16 | House passed in concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Placed on House Calendar (05/16/2012) | |
2012-05-09 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-05-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2012) | |
2012-05-03 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2012-05-02 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-04-27 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2012) | |
2012-04-26 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-04-24 | Scheduled for consideration (04/26/2012) | |
2012-03-07 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-05 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2012) | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2247.pdf |