RI S2233 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the court, to consider certain new standards, when deciding whether or not to grant amendments to conservation restrictions.
Title
Conservation And Preservation Restrictions On Real Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-08 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2016) |
2016-06-01 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2016) |
2016-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2016) |
2016-05-17 | House | Meeting postponed (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/02/2016) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |