RI S2226 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Requires hospitals to offer immunization against influenza virus to all inpatients sixty-five (65) years of age or older from October to March of the following year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing Of Health Care Facilities - Influenza Immunization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Influenza immunization approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed as amended in concurrence
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-01HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-31SenateSenate passed as amended (floor amendment)
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/31/2018)
2018-05-24SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-05-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018)
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback