RI S2226 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires hospitals to offer immunization against influenza virus to all inpatients sixty-five (65) years of age or older from October to March of the following year.
Title
Licensing Of Health Care Facilities - Influenza Immunization
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Influenza immunization approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Influenza immunization approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-20 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-01 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2018) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |