RI S2222 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require all RI hospitals to annually compile a list of the average charges for 25 most commonly performed outpatient and inpatient procedures and to submit these lists to the department of health.
Title
Hospital Charges
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] |
Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-05 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2014) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2014) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |