RI S2221 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires criminal records check for all applicants for employment with BHDDH/any facility/program operated by BHDDH with routine, unsupervised with individuals/organizations employing 250 or more employees with checks every 5yrs. of continuous employment.
Title
Employee Criminal Records Check
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2022) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |