RI S2212 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Property -- Leased Land Dwellings (provide For Fair/reasonable Compensation Of Homeowners For Removal/destruction Of Their Residential Property On Leased Land, And Would Provide For Process Of Arbitration For A Landowner/homeowner To Resolve Dispute Over The Compensation To Be Paid)
Title
An Act Relating To Property -- Leased Land Dwellings (provide For Fair/reasonable Compensation Of Homeowners For Removal/destruction Of Their Residential Property On Leased Land, And Would Provide For Process Of Arbitration For A Landowner/homeowner To Resolve Dispute Over The Compensation To Be Paid)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-27 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-11 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2212.pdf |