RI S2208 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Entitles correctional officers with twenty-five (25) years of service and who are at least fifty-five (55) years of age to a non-Medicare-eligible retiree health care insurance benefit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Benefits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-06-19SenateSenate read and passed
2018-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-08SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-05-15SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback