RI S2201 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt the trade-in value of pickup trucks which are used exclusively for personal use from sales tax as presently available to automobiles
Title
Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] |
Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee heard |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2014) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2201.pdf |