RI S2197 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates restricted receipt account for all 911 funds and requires these funds to be used solely for operation of the 911 system.
Title
911 Emergency Telephone Number Act--prepaid Wireless E-911 Charge Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2197.pdf |