RI S2187 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the Rite Track Program to provide health care coverage to children up to age nineteen (19) funded by federal funds, if available, or if not available, by state funds.
Title
Health Care For Children And Pregnant Women
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |