RI S2178 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the public utilities commission to establish a docket to review and analyze solar energy development in Rhode Island.
Title
Renewable Energy Standard -- Solar Energy Analysis
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2022) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |