RI S2176 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island public power utility council.
Title
The Rhode Island Public Power Utility Council Act
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2176.pdf |