RI S2163 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the state from restricting persons from terminating pregnancy prior to fetal viability. Would repeal laws regulating abortion.
Title
The Reproductive Health Care Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Committee heard |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (05/31/2018) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2163.pdf |