RI S2163 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the grandfather clause pertaining to licensing of underground utility contractors granted without examination to July 1, 2017.
Title
Underground Utility Contractors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (02/03/2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2163.pdf |