RI S2156 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the earned income tax credit from ten percent (10%) to twelve and one-half percent (12.5%) for tax year 2016 and to twenty percent (20%) for tax year 2017 and beyond.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2016) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2156.pdf |