RI S2153 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
WATERS AND NAVIGATION -- FRESHWATER LAKE MANAGEMENT PROGRAM - Establishes the Rhode Island lake management program and a restricted receipt account as a fund within the department of environmental management to aid with lake and pond management issues relating to the control of aquatic invasive plants.
Title
Establishes the Rhode Island lake management program and a restricted receipt account as a fund within the department of environmental management to aid with lake and pond management issues relating to the control of aquatic invasive plants.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Victoria Gu [D] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/23/2024) |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |