RI S2147 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the minimum wage gradually up to fifteen dollars ($15.00) per hour by the year 2024.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Relations - minimum wages approval of amendment (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Relations - minimum wages approval of amendment (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Relations - minimum wages approval of amendment (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Relations - minimum wages approval of amendment (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-04 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/04/2020) |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2020-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2020) |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/05/2020) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2020) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |