RI S2146 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases marital estate deduction if proper election made by decedent spouse's estate allowing decedent to transfer unused portion of estate tax exemption to spouse.
Title
Estate And Transfer Taxes--liability And Computation
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Mark Gee [R] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2018) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2146.pdf |