RI S2145 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for payment responsibility of sending district to school department of East Providence for any child attending Bradley Hospital.
Title
Children With Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2016) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |