RI S2139 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Celebrating The 10th Annual "physician Anesthesiologists Week" On January 28th Through February 3, 2024, In The State Of Rhode Island
Title
SENATE RESOLUTION CELEBRATING THE 10TH ANNUAL "PHYSICIAN ANESTHESIOLOGISTS WEEK" ON JANUARY 28TH THROUGH FEBRUARY 3, 2024, IN THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (01/25/2024) |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2139.pdf |