RI S2139 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows happy hour drink specials served in conjunction with meals prepared on the premises sufficient to constitute breakfast, lunch or dinner, excluding snacks.
Title
Retail Licenses -- Happy Hour
Sponsors
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2139.pdf |