RI S2136 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a special motor vehicle registration plate for recipients of the United States Bronze Star Medal.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-09 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-03 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/09/2022) |
2022-06-02 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/07/2022) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |