RI S2136 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals current state law regarding paternity and replaces it with a more comprehensive parentage act that provides procedures establishing parentage, genetic testing, surrogacy agreements and assisted reproduction.
Title
Uniform Law On Paternity -- Uniform Parentage Act
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Rhode island parentage act approval of amendment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Rhode island parentage act approval of amendment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B as amended in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment) |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-07 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2020-07-03 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2020-07-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (07/07/2020) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/11/2020) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2020) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |