RI S2134 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits discrimination in housing against those persons who have a lawful source of income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Housing Practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Fair housing practices approval of amendment (Y: 2 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2020-02-11SenateSenate read and passed
2020-02-05SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (02/11/2020)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee recommends passage
2020-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2020)
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback