RI S2134 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the attorney general to report annually to the general assembly on the incidence and disposition of crimes involving guns.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department Of Attorney General -- Gun Crimes Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2018-06-19SenateSenate read and passed
2018-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-08SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-03-06SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018)
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback