RI S2133 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows James R. Boyd, Jr., to join Alyssa Lynn LaValley and Andrew James Fleming in marriage on or about July 25, 2020, within the City of East Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-05 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2020-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2020) |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/05/2020) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/30/2020) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |