RI S2118 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Permits city and town councils, at their options, to enter into agreements with police departments of colleges and universities, to permit such police to cooperate in responding to emergency situations.
Title
Emergency Police Power
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Emergency police power approval of amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Emergency police power approval of amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2016) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |