RI S2116 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tax exemption for tangible business or personal property in whole or in part within the town of Bristol's community limits, subject to authorization by the action of the town council of the town of Bristol.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-27 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2020) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |