RI S2116 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Regulates activities of offshore drilling for oil and gas in federal waters to minimize adverse effects resulting therefrom within the state's territorial waters and coastline.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Offshore Oil And Gas Drilling And Exploration Activities Control Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-03-20SenateMeeting postponed (03/21/2018)
2018-03-16SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback