RI S2113 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that public schools of this state, beginning in kindergarten and continuing through and including grade twelve (12), would annually provide access for every student to at least one field trip to a nature preserve, reserve, or conservatory.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2018) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |