RI S2113 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a primary caregiver cardholder to possess a reasonable amount of unusable marijuana, including up to twelve (12) seedlings that would not be counted toward the limits provided by law.
Title
The Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2016) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2113.pdf |