RI S2098 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts volunteer fire companies under the supervision, control, or jurisdiction of another public body from certain posting requirements of the open meetings act.
Title
Open Meetings
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/15/2018) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |