RI S2092 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Dignity at Work Act, to provide workers with more protection from bullying and harassment in the workplace.
Title
Dignity At Work Act
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2020) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |