RI S2076 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspend the imposition of the minimum business corporation tax of five hundred dollars ($500) for a period of three (3) years from the date of its incorporation with the secretary of state
Title
Business Corporation Tax
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2014) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2076.pdf |