RI S2045 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides applicants/licensees for fossil fuel electricity generating facilities invest in renewable energy facilities with application denial/revocation of license for failure to comply with renewable energy requirements.
Title
Energy Facility Siting Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |