RI S2045 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the implementation and operation of sports wagering at the Twin River and Tiverton gaming facilities.
Title
Relating To Video Lottery Games, Table Games And Sports Wagering
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |