RI S2045 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Middletown to issue not more than $5,000,000 bonds and notes to finance the design, construction, repair, rehabilitation and improvement of streets and sidewalks in the town.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Middletown To Finance The Design, Construction, Repair, Rehabilitation And Improvement Of Streets And Sidewalks In The Town, Including, But Not Limited To, Paving, Drainage, Traffic Control Devices, Safety Improvements And Landscaping By The Issuance Of Not More Than $5,000,000 Bonds And/or Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-04-29 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/28/2016) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2016) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |