RI S2026 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes a facility's potential detrimental impact on the community as a factor to be considered when approving the construction or operation of a solid waste management facility.
Title
Refuse Disposal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2018) |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/22/2018) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |