RI S2025 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Expands drug awareness programs to high schools, directs funding from certain civil fines and mandates establishment of criteria for funding.
Title
The Uniformed Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Substances act approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/15/2018) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2018) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Meeting postponed (01/23/2018) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |