RI S2020 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An abutting owner or occupant of land upon any Coventry street in which there is a sewer would not be required to connect to the town sewage works, unless there is a sale or transfer of the property, or when the town council so orders.
Title
In Amendment Of Chapter 330 Of The Public Laws Of 1997 As Amended By Chapter 140 Of The Public Laws Of 2006, Pertaining To Sewers In The Town Of Coventry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Sewers approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2018) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |