RI S2007 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows voting by mail without needing an excuse/improves voter roll cleanup/allows applying for mail ballots through online system/allows nursing home residents to receive mail ballot applications automatically/codifies mail ballot drop box requirements.
Title
Secretary Of State -- Let Ri Vote Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary: Be held for further study (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary: Be held for further study (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-25 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-05-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2022) |
2022-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2022) |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred to House State Government & Elections |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2022) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |